Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Financial Institutions - Student Loan Servicers - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Office of the Attorney General) and Senators Augustine, Guzzone, Kelley, King, Lee, Peters, Pinsky, and Rosapepe
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a student loan servicer from employing any scheme, device, or artifice to mislead a student loan borrower; prohibiting a student loan servicer from engaging in any unfair, abusive, or deceptive trade practice toward any person; prohibiting a student loan servicer from knowingly or recklessly misapplying or refusing to correct a misapplication of a payment from a student loan borrower; requiring a student loan servicer to acknowledge receipt of a written inquiry or complaint from a certain borrower within 10 days; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0594
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {787879/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {763025/1 (Senator Pinsky)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {763025/1 (Senator Pinsky)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/21 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {763025/1 (Senator Pinsky) Withdrawn
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {673224/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Financial Institutions - Student Loan Servicers - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/19/2019 3/17/2019 Favorable with Amendments {787879/1 Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2019 3/17/2019 Floor Amendment {763025/1 (Senator Pinsky) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2019 3/17/2019 Motion Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Floor Amendment {763025/1 (Senator Pinsky) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Motion Special Order until 3/21 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2019 3/19/2019 Floor Amendment {763025/1 (Senator Pinsky) Withdrawn 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2019 3/19/2019 Floor Amendment {673224/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2019 3/19/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Financial Institutions - Student Loan Servicers - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2019 3/18/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2019 3/27/2019 Rereferred to Economic Matters
(   26-601 through 26-604 )
(   11-610, 2-104.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page