Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Services for Children With Down Syndrome (Micah's Law)
Sponsored by
Senators Manno, Astle, Benson, Brochin, Colburn, Currie, Edwards, Ferguson, Forehand, Frosh, Glassman, Jacobs, Jones-Rodwell, King, Klausmeier, Madaleno, McFadden, Montgomery, Muse, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Ramirez, Reilly, Rosapepe, Stone, Young, and Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to apply to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for a specified waiver in order to receive federal matching funds for specified services to specified children with Down syndrome who are under the age of 22 years.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/04/2014
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/04/2014 2/04/2014 Reassigned to Finance 18
Senate 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM