Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Employees', Teachers', and Correctional Officers' Systems - Active Members - Death Benefits
Sponsored by
Senator Griffith (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 208
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing certain survivor benefits to certain surviving children of certain members of the State Retirement and Pension System; providing for the payment of a certain allowance to surviving children of a member when there is no surviving spouse; providing for the distribution of a certain allowance to surviving children; allowing certain surviving children to participate in the State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0860
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {549733/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 208
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 9:00 a.m.
Text - First - Employees', Teachers', and Correctional Officers' Systems - Active Members - Death Benefits
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 8:30 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments {549733/1 Adopted 57
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Text - Third - Employees', Teachers', and Correctional Officers' Systems - Active Members - Death Benefits
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 58
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 58
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Rereferred to Appropriations
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 61
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 208
Text - Chapter - Employees', Teachers', and Correctional Officers' Systems - Active Members - Death Benefits
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-507, 29-202, 29-205, 29-206 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM