Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program - Power to the People Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Office of Home Energy Programs, in coordination with the United Way of Central Maryland and the Fuel Fund of Maryland, to establish the Power to the People Pilot Program on or before July 1, 2021, to expand access to the Critical Medical Needs Program; requiring the Pilot Program to provide training for certain individuals in the Critical Medical Needs Program; requiring the United Way of Central Maryland to develop a certain screening intake process; terminating the Act after June 30, 2023; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0938
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program - Power to the People Pilot Program
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/24/2020 9:31 AM