Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Attorney General, Office Of The

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0280 /CH0149 (SB0234/CH0150)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Suspension of Driver's License or Registration - Unpaid Citations or Judgments
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0334 (SB0262)
Title
Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Definitions and Legislative Intent
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0233 (HB0003)
Title
Business Regulation - Flavored Tobacco Products - Prohibition
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0234 /CH0150 (HB0280/CH0149)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Suspension of Driver's License or Registration - Unpaid Citations or Judgments
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0262 (HB0334)
Title
Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Definitions and Legislative Intent
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0280 /CH0149 (SB0234/CH0150) Vehicle Laws - Suspension of Driver's License or Registration - Unpaid Citations or Judgments By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 149
Judiciary
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0334 (SB0262) Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Definitions and Legislative Intent By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0233 (HB0003) Business Regulation - Flavored Tobacco Products - Prohibition By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0234 /CH0150 (HB0280/CH0149) Vehicle Laws - Suspension of Driver's License or Registration - Unpaid Citations or Judgments By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 150
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0262 (HB0334) Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Definitions and Legislative Intent By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:12 PM