Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Budget And Taxation Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0019 /CH0112
Title
Economic Development - Biotechnology Investment Incentive Tax Credit Program - Alterations and Study
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0146 /CH0128
Title
Department of Juvenile Services – Deputy Secretaries
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0160 /CH0113
Title
Economic Development - Cybersecurity Investment Incentive Tax Credit Program - Expansion, Extension, and Study
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0174
Title
Property Tax Assessments – 5–Year Assessment Cycle
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0186
Title
Economic Development – Job Creation Tax Credit – Credit for Hiring Veterans
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0196 /CH0114
Title
Economic Development – Research and Development Tax Credit – Alterations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0240
Title
Maryland Information Technology Development Project Fund – Sources of Revenue
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0259
Title
Department of Transportation - Grant Anticipation Revenue Vehicle Bonds - Calculation of Debt Limit
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0306
Title
Enterprise Zones - Reimbursements to Local Governments - Request Deadline and Recovery of Overpayment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0325 /CH0108
Title
Tax Sales – Redemption – Nondelinquent Taxes
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0019 /CH0112 Economic Development - Biotechnology Investment Incentive Tax Credit Program - Alterations and Study By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0146 /CH0128 Department of Juvenile Services – Deputy Secretaries By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0160 /CH0113 Economic Development - Cybersecurity Investment Incentive Tax Credit Program - Expansion, Extension, and Study By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0174 Property Tax Assessments – 5–Year Assessment Cycle By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0186 Economic Development – Job Creation Tax Credit – Credit for Hiring Veterans By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0196 /CH0114 Economic Development – Research and Development Tax Credit – Alterations By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0240 Maryland Information Technology Development Project Fund – Sources of Revenue By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0259 Department of Transportation - Grant Anticipation Revenue Vehicle Bonds - Calculation of Debt Limit By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0306 Enterprise Zones - Reimbursements to Local Governments - Request Deadline and Recovery of Overpayment By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0325 /CH0108 Tax Sales – Redemption – Nondelinquent Taxes By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 108
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:26 PM
Click to return on the top page