Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Charles County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0335 (SB0432)
Title
Charles County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0344
Title
Video Lottery Operation License - Expansion and Alterations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0345 (SB0431)
Title
Charles County - Tax Increment Financing and Special Taxing Districts
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0384 (SB0429)
Title
Charles County - Illegal Disposal of Bulky Items - Penalties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0387 (SB0805)
Title
Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0443 (SB0430)
Title
Southern Maryland Code Counties - Collective Bargaining
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0482 (SB0428)
Title
Southern Maryland - Homeowners Association Commission - Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0335 (SB0432) Charles County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0344 Video Lottery Operation License - Expansion and Alterations By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0345 (SB0431) Charles County - Tax Increment Financing and Special Taxing Districts By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0384 (SB0429) Charles County - Illegal Disposal of Bulky Items - Penalties By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0387 (SB0805) Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0443 (SB0430) Southern Maryland Code Counties - Collective Bargaining By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Appropriations
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0482 (SB0428) Southern Maryland - Homeowners Association Commission - Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 11:32 AM