Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Charles County Senators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0428 (HB0482)
Title
Southern Maryland - Homeowners Association Commission - Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0429 (HB0384)
Title
Charles County - Illegal Disposal of Bulky Items - Penalties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0430 (HB0443)
Title
Southern Maryland Code Counties - Collective Bargaining
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0431 (HB0345)
Title
Charles County - Tax Increment Financing and Special Taxing Districts
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0432 (HB0335)
Title
Charles County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0805 (HB0387)
Title
Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0428 (HB0482) Southern Maryland - Homeowners Association Commission - Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2020 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0429 (HB0384) Charles County - Illegal Disposal of Bulky Items - Penalties By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2020 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0430 (HB0443) Southern Maryland Code Counties - Collective Bargaining By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0431 (HB0345) Charles County - Tax Increment Financing and Special Taxing Districts By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0432 (HB0335) Charles County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0805 (HB0387) Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2020 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 4:56 PM