Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Commission To Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0044 (SB0047/CH0506)
Title
Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland - Extension and Alteration
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0934 /CH0375 (SB0838/CH0376)
Title
Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1024 (SB0837)
Title
Criminal Law - Public Safety - Interference With Agencies and Services - Prohibitions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0047 /CH0506 (HB0044)
Title
Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland - Extension and Alteration
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0837 (HB1024)
Title
Criminal Law - Public Safety - Interference With Agencies and Services - Prohibitions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0838 /CH0376 (HB0934/CH0375)
Title
Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0044 (SB0047/CH0506) Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland - Extension and Alteration By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Health and Government Operations
1/29/2020 - 2:00 PM
Finance
HB0934 /CH0375 (SB0838/CH0376) Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 375
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1024 (SB0837) Criminal Law - Public Safety - Interference With Agencies and Services - Prohibitions By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0047 /CH0506 (HB0044) Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland - Extension and Alteration By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 506
Finance
1/30/2020 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0837 (HB1024) Criminal Law - Public Safety - Interference With Agencies and Services - Prohibitions By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0838 /CH0376 (HB0934/CH0375) Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 376
Finance
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 3:31 PM