Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Agriculture, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0161 /CH0088
Title
Nutrient Management – Nonagricultural Fertilizer Application – Requirements and Penalties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0009 /CH0496
Title
Agriculture - Maryland Egg Law - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0092 /CH0519
Title
Secretary of Agriculture - Weed Control Law
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0118 /CH0532
Title
Land Use - Alcohol Production and Agricultural Alcohol Production
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0161 /CH0088 Nutrient Management – Nonagricultural Fertilizer Application – Requirements and Penalties By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 88
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
SB0009 /CH0496 Agriculture - Maryland Egg Law - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 496
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2020 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0092 /CH0519 Secretary of Agriculture - Weed Control Law By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 519
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2020 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0118 /CH0532 Land Use - Alcohol Production and Agricultural Alcohol Production By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 532
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2020 - 2:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/14/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 3:36 PM