Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Assessments And Taxation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0106
Title
Licensing – Good Standing With the State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Requirement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0174
Title
Property Tax Assessments – 5–Year Assessment Cycle
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0181 /CH0106
Title
Corporations and Associations - Trade Name Certificates - Requirements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0306
Title
Enterprise Zones - Reimbursements to Local Governments - Request Deadline and Recovery of Overpayment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0320 /CH0107
Title
Foreign Corporations - Resident Agents - State Department of Assessments and Taxation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0325 /CH0108
Title
Tax Sales – Redemption – Nondelinquent Taxes
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0106 Licensing – Good Standing With the State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Requirement By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (92-42)
Finance
1/14/2021 - 11:00 AM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0174 Property Tax Assessments – 5–Year Assessment Cycle By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0181 /CH0106 Corporations and Associations - Trade Name Certificates - Requirements By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2021 - 11:30 AM
Economic Matters
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0306 Enterprise Zones - Reimbursements to Local Governments - Request Deadline and Recovery of Overpayment By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0320 /CH0107 Foreign Corporations - Resident Agents - State Department of Assessments and Taxation By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 107
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2021 - 11:30 AM
Economic Matters
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0325 /CH0108 Tax Sales – Redemption – Nondelinquent Taxes By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 108
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:22 PM
Click to return on the top page