Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Environment, Department Of The

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0061
Title
Environment - Solid Waste, Recycling, and Anaerobic Digestion
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0325
Title
Environment - Bay Restoration Fund - Use of Funds - Nutrient Credit Purchases
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0797 /CH0631
Title
Nontidal Wetlands - Nontidal Wetland Mitigation Banking
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0061 Environment - Solid Waste, Recycling, and Anaerobic Digestion By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0325 Environment - Bay Restoration Fund - Use of Funds - Nutrient Credit Purchases By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0797 /CH0631 Nontidal Wetlands - Nontidal Wetland Mitigation Banking By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 631
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM