Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Environment, Department Of The

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0121 /CH0375
Title
Environment - Hazardous Material Security - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0124 /CH0376
Title
Environment - Solid Waste and Recycling Facilities
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0125 /CH0377
Title
Environment - Emergency Action Plans for Dams
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0133 /CH0378
Title
Environment - Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Notification of Elevated Blood Lead Level
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0121 /CH0375 Environment - Hazardous Material Security - Repeal By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 375
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0124 /CH0376 Environment - Solid Waste and Recycling Facilities By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 376
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0125 /CH0377 Environment - Emergency Action Plans for Dams By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 377
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0133 /CH0378 Environment - Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Notification of Elevated Blood Lead Level By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 378
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM