Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

General Services, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0649
Title
State Finance and Procurement – Procedures and Pricing and Selection Committee for Preferred Providers
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0662 /CH0289
Title
Department of General Services - Energy Consumption Goals and Energy Performance Contracts
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0007 /CH0494
Title
Maryland Green Building Council - Membership
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0649 State Finance and Procurement – Procedures and Pricing and Selection Committee for Preferred Providers By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0662 /CH0289 Department of General Services - Energy Consumption Goals and Energy Performance Contracts By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 289
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
SB0007 /CH0494 Maryland Green Building Council - Membership By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 494
Budget and Taxation
1/09/2020 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 1:54 PM