Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Human Services, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0386
Title
Child Support - Potential Income - Definition
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0061 /CH0412
Title
Child Support - Noncustodial Parent Employment Assistance Pilot Program - Documentation and Reporting
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0079 /CH0413
Title
Child Support - Employment Program Participation - Reinstatement of Driver's License and Expungement of Suspension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0085 /CH0369
Title
Tuition Waivers - Foster Care Recipients - Eligibility
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0097 /CH0051
Title
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Disclosure of Records
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0386 Child Support - Potential Income - Definition By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0061 /CH0412 Child Support - Noncustodial Parent Employment Assistance Pilot Program - Documentation and Reporting By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 412
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2018 - 3:00 PM
Judiciary
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0079 /CH0413 Child Support - Employment Program Participation - Reinstatement of Driver's License and Expungement of Suspension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 413
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2018 - 3:00 PM
Judiciary
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0085 /CH0369 Tuition Waivers - Foster Care Recipients - Eligibility By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 369
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0097 /CH0051 Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Disclosure of Records By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 51
Finance
1/16/2018 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM