Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Insurance Administration, Maryland

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0144 /CH0077
Title
Insurance - Uninsured or Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage - Property Damage
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0050
Title
Insurance - Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Notice of Cancellation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0093 /CH0520
Title
Insurance - Nonresident Insurance Producers - Cancellation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0095 /CH0521
Title
Public Adjusters - Disbursement of Insurance Settlement Payments
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0096 /CH0522
Title
Insurance - Third Party Administrators - Term and Reinstatement of Registration
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0097 /CH0523
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Protests - Consumer Complaint Portal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0098 /CH0524
Title
Health Insurance - Technical Correction and Required Conformity With Federal Law
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0099 /CH0525
Title
Health Insurance Benefit Cards, Prescription Benefit Cards, and Other Technology - Identification of Regulatory Agency
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0111 /CH0527
Title
Insurance - Universal and Variable Life Insurance - Notice
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0112
Title
Health Insurance - Health Information - Disclosures Between Carriers
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0113
Title
Health Insurance - Provider Panels - Definitions of Provider and Health Care Services
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0144 /CH0077 Insurance - Uninsured or Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage - Property Damage By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 77
Economic Matters
1/30/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/16/2020 - 10:00 AM
SB0050 Insurance - Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Notice of Cancellation By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
1/09/2020 - 1:45 PM
SB0093 /CH0520 Insurance - Nonresident Insurance Producers - Cancellation By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 520
Finance
1/14/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0095 /CH0521 Public Adjusters - Disbursement of Insurance Settlement Payments By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 521
Finance
1/14/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0096 /CH0522 Insurance - Third Party Administrators - Term and Reinstatement of Registration By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 522
Finance
1/23/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0097 /CH0523 Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Protests - Consumer Complaint Portal By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 523
Finance
1/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0098 /CH0524 Health Insurance - Technical Correction and Required Conformity With Federal Law By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 524
Finance
1/15/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
SB0099 /CH0525 Health Insurance Benefit Cards, Prescription Benefit Cards, and Other Technology - Identification of Regulatory Agency By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 525
Finance
1/15/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
SB0111 /CH0527 Insurance - Universal and Variable Life Insurance - Notice By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 527
Finance
1/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
SB0112 Health Insurance - Health Information - Disclosures Between Carriers By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Finance
1/14/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
SB0113 Health Insurance - Provider Panels - Definitions of Provider and Health Care Services By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/15/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/1/2020 2:17 PM