Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Department Of Labor

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0153
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Building Performance Standards
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0220
Title
Income Tax Credit - Employment of Apprentices - Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0855
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Money Transmissions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0006 /CH0493
Title
State Real Estate Commission - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0012 /CH0497
Title
Professional Engineers – Qualifications for Licensure – Experience Requirement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0014 /CH0498
Title
Financial Institutions - State Banks, Trust Companies, and Savings Banks - Incorporators
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0015 /CH0499
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Banking Institution Powers
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0070
Title
Correctional Institutions - Correctional Education Council - Mandatory Education Program Requirements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0071 /CH0511
Title
State Board of Pilots - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0116 /CH0530
Title
Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0117 /CH0531
Title
Real Estate Appraisers and Real Estate Appraiser Trainees - Licenses and Certificates - Experience, Renewal, and Reinstatement Requirements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0119 /CH0533
Title
Labor and Employment - Wage Payment and Collection - Order to Pay Wages
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0153 Public Safety - Maryland Building Performance Standards By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0220 Income Tax Credit - Employment of Apprentices - Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0855 Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Money Transmissions By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed
Economic Matters
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0006 /CH0493 State Real Estate Commission - Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 493
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/09/2020 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0012 /CH0497 Professional Engineers – Qualifications for Licensure – Experience Requirement By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 497
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0014 /CH0498 Financial Institutions - State Banks, Trust Companies, and Savings Banks - Incorporators By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 498
Finance
1/22/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0015 /CH0499 Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Banking Institution Powers By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 499
Finance
1/22/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0070 Correctional Institutions - Correctional Education Council - Mandatory Education Program Requirements By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Finance
1/30/2020 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
Ways and Means
SB0071 /CH0511 State Board of Pilots - Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 511
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/09/2020 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0116 /CH0530 Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 530
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/09/2020 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0117 /CH0531 Real Estate Appraisers and Real Estate Appraiser Trainees - Licenses and Certificates - Experience, Renewal, and Reinstatement Requirements By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 531
Finance
1/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0119 /CH0533 Labor and Employment - Wage Payment and Collection - Order to Pay Wages By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 533
Finance
1/23/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:22 PM