Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Archives, Maryland State

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0148 /CH0111
Title
State Archives - Care of Fine Art or Decorative Art - Procurement Exemption
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0044 /CH0539
Title
Records Management and Preservation - State Units and Public Officials - Responsibilities
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0148 /CH0111 State Archives - Care of Fine Art or Decorative Art - Procurement Exemption By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111
Health and Government Operations
1/26/2017 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0044 /CH0539 Records Management and Preservation - State Units and Public Officials - Responsibilities By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 539
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM