Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Natural Resources, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0615 /CH0415
Title
Coast Smart Council
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0093 /CH0022
Title
Natural Resources - Recreational Incentives Pilot Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0094
Title
Vessels - Operating While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or Drugs
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0615 /CH0415 Coast Smart Council By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Environmental Matters
2/12/2014 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0093 /CH0022 Natural Resources - Recreational Incentives Pilot Program By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 22
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2014 - 3:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0094 Vessels - Operating While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or Drugs By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM
Click to return on the top page