Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Natural Resources, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0173 /CH0095
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0114 /CH0528
Title
Natural Resources - Nuisance Organisms - Pilot Projects and Northern Snakeheads
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0173 /CH0095 Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 95
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
SB0114 /CH0528 Natural Resources - Nuisance Organisms - Pilot Projects and Northern Snakeheads By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 528
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 3:36 PM