Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Workers' Compensation Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1330 /CH0676
Title
Workers' Compensation - Insurance Coverage - Employer Compliance
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0065 /CH0016
Title
Workers' Compensation - Claim Processing - Electronic Delivery of Decisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1330 /CH0676 Workers' Compensation - Insurance Coverage - Employer Compliance By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 676
Economic Matters
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0065 /CH0016 Workers' Compensation - Claim Processing - Electronic Delivery of Decisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 16
Finance
1/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM