Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Harford County Senators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0373 (HB0962)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Assisted Living Program License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0374
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Operator License Holder - Establishment Operations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0375 (HB0864)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel Lobby License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0376 (HB0971)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class GCR (Golf Course Restaurant) Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0377 (HB1318)
Title
Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Place of Worship Restrictions – Exemptions and Waivers
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0378
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Barbershop and Beauty Salon License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0379 (HB0972)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C-3 License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0380 (HB0829)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class DLR License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0381 (HB1187)
Title
Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Bowling Alley License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0382
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Holder Requirements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0383 (HB0865)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-3 License - Restaurant
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0384
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Holders - Requirements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0385 (HB0923)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT (Movie Theater) License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0496 (HB0963)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - On-Sale License Record Keeping and Enforcement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0578 (HB1014)
Title
Electricity - Considerations for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity and Overhead Transmission Lines
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0599 (HB1177)
Title
Sheriff of Harford County - Salary
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0755
Title
Education - Harford County - Liability of School Bus Contractors
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0373 (HB0962) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Assisted Living Program License By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0374 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Operator License Holder - Establishment Operations By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0375 (HB0864) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel Lobby License By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0376 (HB0971) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class GCR (Golf Course Restaurant) Beer, Wine, and Liquor License By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0377 (HB1318) Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Place of Worship Restrictions – Exemptions and Waivers By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0378 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Barbershop and Beauty Salon License By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0379 (HB0972) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C-3 License By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0380 (HB0829) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class DLR License By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0381 (HB1187) Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Bowling Alley License By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0382 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Holder Requirements By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0383 (HB0865) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-3 License - Restaurant By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0384 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Holders - Requirements By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0385 (HB0923) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT (Movie Theater) License By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0496 (HB0963) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - On-Sale License Record Keeping and Enforcement By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0578 (HB1014) Electricity - Considerations for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity and Overhead Transmission Lines By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0599 (HB1177) Sheriff of Harford County - Salary By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2020 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0755 Education - Harford County - Liability of School Bus Contractors By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 4:57 PM