Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Judiciary Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0262 /CH0141
Title
Criminal Procedure - Examination of Defendant by Maryland Department of Health - Access to Judicial Records
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0622
Title
Correctional Services - Correctional Officers - Minimum Age Requirement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0647
Title
Child Support - Reporting of Employment Information
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0667 /CH0291
Title
Child Support - Annual Collection Fee
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0670
Title
Family Law - Investigation of Suspected Child Abuse and Neglect - Preliminary Report to State's Attorney
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0672 /CH0296
Title
Children in Need of Assistance - Qualified Residential Treatment Program - Definition
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0673 /CH0297
Title
Juvenile Services - Facilities - Garrett Children's Center
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0674 /CH0298
Title
Controlled Dangerous Substances - Schedules
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1217
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act - Conditions of Release - Technical Revocation Caps
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0262 /CH0141 Criminal Procedure - Examination of Defendant by Maryland Department of Health - Access to Judicial Records By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 141
Judiciary
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0622 Correctional Services - Correctional Officers - Minimum Age Requirement By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0647 Child Support - Reporting of Employment Information By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0667 /CH0291 Child Support - Annual Collection Fee By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 291
Judiciary
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0670 Family Law - Investigation of Suspected Child Abuse and Neglect - Preliminary Report to State's Attorney By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Judiciary
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0672 /CH0296 Children in Need of Assistance - Qualified Residential Treatment Program - Definition By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 296
Judiciary
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0673 /CH0297 Juvenile Services - Facilities - Garrett Children's Center By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 297
Judiciary
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0674 /CH0298 Controlled Dangerous Substances - Schedules By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 298
Judiciary
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1217 Justice Reinvestment Act - Conditions of Release - Technical Revocation Caps By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 1:53 PM