Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Montgomery County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0137
Title
Montgomery County - Elections - Early Voting Centers MC 19-20
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0297 /CH0156
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Catering Extension MC 27-20
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0298 /CH0157
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hours of Consumption MC 09-20
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0377 /CH0186
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption Only Marketplace License MC 11-20
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0791
Title
Montgomery County - Housing Opportunities Commission - Procurement MC 5-20
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0792
Title
Montgomery County - Public Campaign Financing - Board of Education MC 8-20
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0795 /CH0329
Title
Montgomery County - Authority of County Council Over Inspector General - Montgomery County Public Schools MC 14-20
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0798
Title
Montgomery County - Property Tax - Credit for Senior Citizen Volunteers MC 23-20
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0800 /CH0330
Title
Montgomery County - Housing Opportunities Commission - Alterations MC 02-20
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0805 /CH0331
Title
Montgomery County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism MC 26-20
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0807
Title
Montgomery County - Housing Opportunities Commission - Selection of Chair MC 1-20
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0809
Title
Montgomery County - Housing Opportunities Commission - Contracting Out Services - Requirements MC 21-20
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0821
Title
Montgomery County Stable Homes Act MC 12-20
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0825
Title
Montgomery County - Residential Property Advertisements and Sales - School District Information MC 20-20
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0827
Title
Montgomery County – Agricultural Reserve – Deer Management Permits MC 06–20
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0848 /CH0342
Title
Montgomery County - Agricultural Land Transfer Tax - Alterations MC 7-20
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0860 /CH0349
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Town of Kensington MC 15-20
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0874
Title
Montgomery County - Country Clubs and Golf Courses - Annual Land Preservation Fee MC 16-20
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0875
Title
Montgomery County - Distracted Driving Monitoring Systems - Authorization MC 24-20
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0993
Title
Montgomery County - Board of Education - Compensation MC 13-20
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0137 Montgomery County - Elections - Early Voting Centers MC 19-20 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0297 /CH0156 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Catering Extension MC 27-20 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 156
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0298 /CH0157 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hours of Consumption MC 09-20 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 157
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0377 /CH0186 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption Only Marketplace License MC 11-20 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 186
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0791 Montgomery County - Housing Opportunities Commission - Procurement MC 5-20 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0792 Montgomery County - Public Campaign Financing - Board of Education MC 8-20 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0795 /CH0329 Montgomery County - Authority of County Council Over Inspector General - Montgomery County Public Schools MC 14-20 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 329
Ways and Means
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0798 Montgomery County - Property Tax - Credit for Senior Citizen Volunteers MC 23-20 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0800 /CH0330 Montgomery County - Housing Opportunities Commission - Alterations MC 02-20 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 330
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0805 /CH0331 Montgomery County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism MC 26-20 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 331
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0807 Montgomery County - Housing Opportunities Commission - Selection of Chair MC 1-20 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0809 Montgomery County - Housing Opportunities Commission - Contracting Out Services - Requirements MC 21-20 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0821 Montgomery County Stable Homes Act MC 12-20 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0825 Montgomery County - Residential Property Advertisements and Sales - School District Information MC 20-20 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0827 Montgomery County – Agricultural Reserve – Deer Management Permits MC 06–20 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0848 /CH0342 Montgomery County - Agricultural Land Transfer Tax - Alterations MC 7-20 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 342
Ways and Means
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0860 /CH0349 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Town of Kensington MC 15-20 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 349
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0874 Montgomery County - Country Clubs and Golf Courses - Annual Land Preservation Fee MC 16-20 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0875 Montgomery County - Distracted Driving Monitoring Systems - Authorization MC 24-20 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0993 Montgomery County - Board of Education - Compensation MC 13-20 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Special Order until 3/18 (Senator Zucker) Adopted
Ways and Means
2/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 1:39 PM