Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Pensions, Joint Committee On

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0251 /CH0136 (SB0236/CH0137)
Title
Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Obsolete Reemployment Provisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0634 (SB0462/CH0556)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System – Death Benefits for Children
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0753 (SB0463/CH0557)
Title
State Retirement Agency – Monitoring and Recording of Automated Outgoing Telephone Calls – Authorization
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0942 /CH0381 (SB0809/CH0382)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Reemployment Earnings Offset - Clarification
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0948 /CH0387 (SB0764/CH0388)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Pension Benefits - Calculation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0236 /CH0137 (HB0251/CH0136)
Title
Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Obsolete Reemployment Provisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0462 /CH0556 (HB0634)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System – Death Benefits for Children
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0463 /CH0557 (HB0753)
Title
State Retirement Agency - Monitoring and Recording of Automated Outgoing Telephone Calls - Authorization
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0764 /CH0388 (HB0948/CH0387)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Pension Benefits - Calculation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0809 /CH0382 (HB0942/CH0381)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Reemployment Earnings Offset - Clarification
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0251 /CH0136 (SB0236/CH0137) Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Obsolete Reemployment Provisions By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 136
Appropriations
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0634 (SB0462/CH0556) State Retirement and Pension System – Death Benefits for Children By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Appropriations
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0753 (SB0463/CH0557) State Retirement Agency – Monitoring and Recording of Automated Outgoing Telephone Calls – Authorization By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Appropriations
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0942 /CH0381 (SB0809/CH0382) State Retirement and Pension System - Reemployment Earnings Offset - Clarification By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 381
Appropriations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0948 /CH0387 (SB0764/CH0388) State Retirement and Pension System - Pension Benefits - Calculation By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 387
Appropriations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0236 /CH0137 (HB0251/CH0136) Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Obsolete Reemployment Provisions By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 137
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2020 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
SB0462 /CH0556 (HB0634) State Retirement and Pension System – Death Benefits for Children By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 556
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2020 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
SB0463 /CH0557 (HB0753) State Retirement Agency - Monitoring and Recording of Automated Outgoing Telephone Calls - Authorization By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 557
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2020 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
SB0764 /CH0388 (HB0948/CH0387) State Retirement and Pension System - Pension Benefits - Calculation By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 388
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2020 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
SB0809 /CH0382 (HB0942/CH0381) State Retirement and Pension System - Reemployment Earnings Offset - Clarification By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 382
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2020 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:17 PM