Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Anne Arundel County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0087 /CH0336 (SB0747/CH0335)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Superintendent of Schools - Compensation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0591 (SB1015/CH0367)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Tasting Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0825 (SB0639)
Title
Anne Arundel County - State's Attorney and Deputy, Assistant, and Temporary Assistant State's Attorneys - Annual Salary and Compensation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1381 /CH0108
Title
Anne Arundel County - Sheriff - Salary Increases
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1409 /CH0456
Title
Anne Arundel County - Collection of Hotel Taxes and Distribution of Revenues - City of Annapolis
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0552 (SB0246/CH0148)
Title
Public Safety - Anne Arundel Community College Police Force
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1089 (SB0946)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0087 /CH0336 (SB0747/CH0335) Anne Arundel County - Superintendent of Schools - Compensation By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Ways and Means
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0591 (SB1015/CH0367) Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Tasting Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0825 (SB0639) Anne Arundel County - State's Attorney and Deputy, Assistant, and Temporary Assistant State's Attorneys - Annual Salary and Compensation By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environmental Matters
3/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1381 /CH0108 Anne Arundel County - Sheriff - Salary Increases By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 108
Environmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1409 /CH0456 Anne Arundel County - Collection of Hotel Taxes and Distribution of Revenues - City of Annapolis By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456
Ways and Means
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0552 (SB0246/CH0148) Public Safety - Anne Arundel Community College Police Force By Request - Other 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1089 (SB0946) Anne Arundel County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM