Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Anne Arundel County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0027 /CH0394
Title
Task Force on the Disposition of the Crownsville Hospital Center Property
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0173 (SB0135/CH0324)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Heart Disease and Hypertension Presumption - Anne Arundel County Detention Officers
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0175 (SB0167)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Police Officers - Secondary Employment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0331
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0447 /CH0420 (SB0089)
Title
City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Election Days
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0555 /CH0432
Title
Anne Arundel County - Semipermanent Food Service Facilities - Wastewater Disposal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0848 /CH0459 (SB0484)
Title
Anne Arundel County Public Schools Funding Accountability and Transparency Act
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1152
Title
Anne Arundel County - Solicitation of Money or Donations From Occupants of Vehicles - Prohibitions and Permit Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0027 /CH0394 Task Force on the Disposition of the Crownsville Hospital Center Property By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Environment and Transportation
2/05/2015 - 2:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0173 (SB0135/CH0324) Workers' Compensation - Heart Disease and Hypertension Presumption - Anne Arundel County Detention Officers By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0175 (SB0167) Anne Arundel County - Police Officers - Secondary Employment By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0331 Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0447 /CH0420 (SB0089) City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Election Days By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0555 /CH0432 Anne Arundel County - Semipermanent Food Service Facilities - Wastewater Disposal By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0848 /CH0459 (SB0484) Anne Arundel County Public Schools Funding Accountability and Transparency Act By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 459
Ways and Means
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1152 Anne Arundel County - Solicitation of Money or Donations From Occupants of Vehicles - Prohibitions and Permit Program By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM