Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Anne Arundel County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0028
Title
Commission on the Disposition of the Crownsville Hospital Center Property
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0037 /CH0328 (SB0008/CH0327)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Deferrals - Payment Due Date
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0102
Title
Anne Arundel County - Solicitation of Money or Donations From Occupants of Vehicles - Prohibitions and Permit Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0172 /CH0035 (SB0144)
Title
Anne Arundel County Board of Education and School Board Nominating Commission
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0238 /CH0660 (SB0175/CH0659)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Disposition of Fees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0272 (SB0047/CH0042)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Benefit Corporations and Benefit Limited Liability Companies
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0321 /CH0334 (SB0046/CH0333)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0366 /CH0102 (SB0048)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Blind Individuals
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0602 /CH0354 (SB0141/CH0353)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Special Taxing Districts - Water or Wastewater Services
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0642 /CH0110 (SB0033)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0764 (SB0521)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Charitable Gaming
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1273
Title
Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Human Trafficking Awareness Pilot Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0028 Commission on the Disposition of the Crownsville Hospital Center Property By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0037 /CH0328 (SB0008/CH0327) Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Deferrals - Payment Due Date By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 328
Ways and Means
1/27/2016 - 2:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0102 Anne Arundel County - Solicitation of Money or Donations From Occupants of Vehicles - Prohibitions and Permit Program By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0172 /CH0035 (SB0144) Anne Arundel County Board of Education and School Board Nominating Commission By Request - Committee 4 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 35
Ways and Means
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0238 /CH0660 (SB0175/CH0659) Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Disposition of Fees By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 660
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0272 (SB0047/CH0042) Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Benefit Corporations and Benefit Limited Liability Companies By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0321 /CH0334 (SB0046/CH0333) Anne Arundel County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0366 /CH0102 (SB0048) Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Blind Individuals By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 102
Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0602 /CH0354 (SB0141/CH0353) Anne Arundel County - Special Taxing Districts - Water or Wastewater Services By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 354
Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 PM
HB0642 /CH0110 (SB0033) Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 110
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0764 (SB0521) Anne Arundel County - Charitable Gaming By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1273 Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Human Trafficking Awareness Pilot Program By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM