Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Anne Arundel County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0085 /CH0474
Title
Anne Arundel County - Charitable Gaming
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0102
Title
Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Human Trafficking Awareness Pilot Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0695 /CH0096 (SB0930/CH0095)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Economic Development Projects
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0716 /CH0473 (SB0899)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Board of Education
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1269 /CH0060 (SB0251/CH0059)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax - Credit for Seniors of Limited Income
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0085 /CH0474 Anne Arundel County - Charitable Gaming By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474
Ways and Means
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0102 Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Human Trafficking Awareness Pilot Program By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Ways and Means
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0695 /CH0096 (SB0930/CH0095) Anne Arundel County - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Economic Development Projects By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0716 /CH0473 (SB0899) Anne Arundel County - Board of Education By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473
Ways and Means
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1269 /CH0060 (SB0251/CH0059) Anne Arundel County - Property Tax - Credit for Seniors of Limited Income By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 60
Ways and Means
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM