Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Anne Arundel County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0158 /CH0804 (SB0049/CH0805)
Title
Anne Arundel County Board of Elections - Salary
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0309 /CH0070
Title
Anne Arundel County - Practice of Massage - Regulation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1076
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Station Safety Pilot Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1247 /CH0838
Title
Anne Arundel County – Orphans’ Court Judges – Compensation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0429 (SB0265)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Personal Property - Possession and Release
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0158 /CH0804 (SB0049/CH0805) Anne Arundel County Board of Elections - Salary By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 804
Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0309 /CH0070 Anne Arundel County - Practice of Massage - Regulation By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1076 Maryland Transit Administration - Station Safety Pilot Program By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1247 /CH0838 Anne Arundel County – Orphans’ Court Judges – Compensation By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 838
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0429 (SB0265) Anne Arundel County - Personal Property - Possession and Release By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM