Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Anne Arundel County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0374 /CH0642 (SB0309/CH0643)
Title
Anne Arundel County – Alcoholic Beverages – Racetrack and Racetrack Concessionaire Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0459 /CH0069
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcohol Awareness
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0639 /CH0070 (SB0099/CH0071)
Title
Public Safety – Buildings Used for Agritourism
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0770 /CH0693
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Multiple License Interests
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0993 /CH0554 (SB0710/CH0555)
Title
Anne Arundel County – Ethics – Contributions and Participation in Development Applications
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0374 /CH0642 (SB0309/CH0643) Anne Arundel County – Alcoholic Beverages – Racetrack and Racetrack Concessionaire Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 642
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0459 /CH0069 Anne Arundel County - Alcohol Awareness By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 69
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0639 /CH0070 (SB0099/CH0071) Public Safety – Buildings Used for Agritourism By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0770 /CH0693 Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Multiple License Interests By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 693
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0993 /CH0554 (SB0710/CH0555) Anne Arundel County – Ethics – Contributions and Participation in Development Applications By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 554
Environment and Transportation
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM