Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Anne Arundel County Senators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0172 (HB0163)
Title
Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County - Judges Sitting as Orphans' Court
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0173 (HB0113)
Title
Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Selection of Members - Straw Ballot
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0174 (HB0146)
Title
Education - Public Charter Schools - Capital Improvement Requests
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0450
Title
Education Trust Fund - Security Personnel and Equipment and Mental Health Services
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0172 (HB0163) Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County - Judges Sitting as Orphans' Court By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0173 (HB0113) Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Selection of Members - Straw Ballot By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2013 - 1:30 PM
SB0174 (HB0146) Education - Public Charter Schools - Capital Improvement Requests By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0450 Education Trust Fund - Security Personnel and Equipment and Mental Health Services By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM