Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Anne Arundel County Senators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0048 (HB0366/CH0102)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Blind Individuals
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0141 /CH0353 (HB0602/CH0354)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Special Taxing Districts - Water or Wastewater Services
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0142 (HB0566)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Tax Sale Advertising
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0143 (HB0428)
Title
Property Tax - Interest on Refunds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0144 (HB0172/CH0035)
Title
Anne Arundel County - School Board Nominating Commission - Membership
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0188 (HB0427)
Title
Income Tax - Oyster Shell Recycling - Credit Amount
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0521 (HB0764)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Charitable Gaming
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0048 (HB0366/CH0102) Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Blind Individuals By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0141 /CH0353 (HB0602/CH0354) Anne Arundel County - Special Taxing Districts - Water or Wastewater Services By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0142 (HB0566) Anne Arundel County - Tax Sale Advertising By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
SB0143 (HB0428) Property Tax - Interest on Refunds By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
SB0144 (HB0172/CH0035) Anne Arundel County - School Board Nominating Commission - Membership By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0188 (HB0427) Income Tax - Oyster Shell Recycling - Credit Amount By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
SB0521 (HB0764) Anne Arundel County - Charitable Gaming By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM