Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Allegany County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0543 (SB0483/CH0069)
Title
Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Minimum Age to Serve Liquor
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0560 (SB0349)
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Allegany and Garrett Counties - Warrant Intercept Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0577 (SB0431/CH0206)
Title
Allegany County and Garrett County - Annual Financial Reports - Filing Date
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0755 (SB0524)
Title
Allegany County and Garrett County - Black Bears - Baiting
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0987 (SB0900)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Lefty Grove Statue
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0994 /CH0286 (SB0736)
Title
Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales for Class A Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0995 /CH0589 (SB0878/CH0588)
Title
Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1538 (SB1044)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Frostburg Museum Relocation Project
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1539 (SB1045)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Friends Aware Facility
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1540 (SB1025)
Title
Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Ownership Costs
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1541
Title
Higher Education - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Personnel - Partial Tuition Waiver
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0543 (SB0483/CH0069) Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Minimum Age to Serve Liquor By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0560 (SB0349) Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Allegany and Garrett Counties - Warrant Intercept Program By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0577 (SB0431/CH0206) Allegany County and Garrett County - Annual Financial Reports - Filing Date By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0755 (SB0524) Allegany County and Garrett County - Black Bears - Baiting By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0987 (SB0900) Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Lefty Grove Statue By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB0994 /CH0286 (SB0736) Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales for Class A Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 286
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0995 /CH0589 (SB0878/CH0588) Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 589
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1538 (SB1044) Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Frostburg Museum Relocation Project By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB1539 (SB1045) Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Friends Aware Facility By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB1540 (SB1025) Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Ownership Costs By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1541 Higher Education - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Personnel - Partial Tuition Waiver By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM