Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Allegany County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0670
Title
Election Law - Filing Fee - Candidates for President and Vice President
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0720 /CH0167 (SB0486/CH0168)
Title
Allegany County - Orphans' Court Judges - Pension Formula
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0722 /CH0165 (SB0644/CH0166)
Title
Allegany County - All-Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0911 (SB0717)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Camp Potomac
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1067 (SB0716)
Title
Creation of a State Debt – Allegany County – Frostburg Museum Relocation Project
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1068 /CH0163 (SB0645/CH0164)
Title
Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-TM (Theater/Museum) License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0670 Election Law - Filing Fee - Candidates for President and Vice President By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0720 /CH0167 (SB0486/CH0168) Allegany County - Orphans' Court Judges - Pension Formula By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0722 /CH0165 (SB0644/CH0166) Allegany County - All-Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0911 (SB0717) Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Camp Potomac By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB1067 (SB0716) Creation of a State Debt – Allegany County – Frostburg Museum Relocation Project By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB1068 /CH0163 (SB0645/CH0164) Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-TM (Theater/Museum) License By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 163
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM