Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Allegany County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0243 /CH0117 (SB0214/CH0118)
Title
Allegany County - Property Tax Credit - Cumberland Economic Development Corporation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0283 (SB0278)
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0649 (SB0666)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Acceptance of Out-of-State Training
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0866 /CH0699 (SB0667/CH0700)
Title
Allegany County – Alcoholic Beverages – Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0276 /CH0115 (SB0215/CH0116)
Title
Allegany County and Garrett County - School Buses - Length of Operation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0243 /CH0117 (SB0214/CH0118) Allegany County - Property Tax Credit - Cumberland Economic Development Corporation By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 117
Ways and Means
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0283 (SB0278) Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0649 (SB0666) Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Acceptance of Out-of-State Training By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0866 /CH0699 (SB0667/CH0700) Allegany County – Alcoholic Beverages – Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 699
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0276 /CH0115 (SB0215/CH0116) Allegany County and Garrett County - School Buses - Length of Operation By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM