Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Allegany County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0238 (SB0240/CH0541)
Title
Allegany County Board of Education - Elected Members - Filling a Vacancy
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0435 (SB0338)
Title
Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0678 /CH0301 (SB0289/CH0302)
Title
Real Property - Allegany County - Transfer of Property on Assessment Books
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0735 /CH0618 (SB0421/CH0619)
Title
Task Force on the Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority - Reestablishment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0969 (SB0865)
Title
Public Service Company Franchise Tax - Credit for Purchase of Maryland-Mined Coal - Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0238 (SB0240/CH0541) Allegany County Board of Education - Elected Members - Filling a Vacancy By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0435 (SB0338) Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0678 /CH0301 (SB0289/CH0302) Real Property - Allegany County - Transfer of Property on Assessment Books By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 301
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0735 /CH0618 (SB0421/CH0619) Task Force on the Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority - Reestablishment By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 618
Appropriations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0969 (SB0865) Public Service Company Franchise Tax - Credit for Purchase of Maryland-Mined Coal - Extension By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:33 PM