Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Appropriations Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0268 /CH0095
Title
University of Maryland Center for Environmental Science - Joint Graduate Degree Granting Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0553
Title
Higher Education - Program Proposals - Review and Objections
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0616 /CH0123
Title
Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0268 /CH0095 University of Maryland Center for Environmental Science - Joint Graduate Degree Granting Authority By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95
Appropriations
2/05/2013 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0553 Higher Education - Program Proposals - Review and Objections By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0616 /CH0123 Academic Facilities Bonding Authority By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM