Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Appropriations Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0103
Title
Capital Projects - Submission of Information to the General Assembly
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0104 /CH0214
Title
Department of Budget and Management - Budget Analysts - Qualifications
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0207 /CH0589
Title
State Capital Projects - High Performance Buildings - Maryland Green Building Council
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0765 /CH0613
Title
State Personnel - Authority to Set Compensation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0821 (SB0998/CH0575)
Title
Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0822 /CH0239
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Participation in Program - City of Hyattsville and Satellite Organizations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1457 /CH0257
Title
State Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights - Definition of Correctional Officer
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1458 /CH0252
Title
Correctional Services - Charges Recommending Discipline - Investigative Period
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0103 Capital Projects - Submission of Information to the General Assembly By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB0104 /CH0214 Department of Budget and Management - Budget Analysts - Qualifications By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Appropriations
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0207 /CH0589 State Capital Projects - High Performance Buildings - Maryland Green Building Council By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 589
Health and Government Operations
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0765 /CH0613 State Personnel - Authority to Set Compensation By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 613
Appropriations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0821 (SB0998/CH0575) Academic Facilities Bonding Authority By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0822 /CH0239 State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Participation in Program - City of Hyattsville and Satellite Organizations By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 239
Appropriations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1457 /CH0257 State Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights - Definition of Correctional Officer By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257
Appropriations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1458 /CH0252 Correctional Services - Charges Recommending Discipline - Investigative Period By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 252
Appropriations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM