Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Appropriations Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0066 /CH0088
Title
Residential Child Care Capital Grant Program - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0164 /CH0098
Title
State Personnel Management System - Background Investigation and Criminal History Records Check - Prospective and Current Employees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0066 /CH0088 Residential Child Care Capital Grant Program - Repeal By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 88
Appropriations
1/26/2016 - 3:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0164 /CH0098 State Personnel Management System - Background Investigation and Criminal History Records Check - Prospective and Current Employees By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Appropriations
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM