Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Budget And Taxation Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0088 /CH0274
Title
Department of Transportation - Special Bonds and Borrowing - Revenue-Backed Bonds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0095 /CH0128
Title
Comptroller - Monitoring and Recording of Telephone Calls - Training, Quality Assurance, and Employee Safety
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0106 /CH0129
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Property Between Business Entities - Reorganizations - Exemption
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0123 /CH0137
Title
Major Information Technology Development Project Fund - Revenue Sources and Authorized Expenditures
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0128
Title
Education - Compensatory Education Grants - Federal Community Eligibility Provision
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0998 /CH0575 (HB0821)
Title
Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0088 /CH0274 Department of Transportation - Special Bonds and Borrowing - Revenue-Backed Bonds By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274
Budget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0095 /CH0128 Comptroller - Monitoring and Recording of Telephone Calls - Training, Quality Assurance, and Employee Safety By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128
Budget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0106 /CH0129 Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Property Between Business Entities - Reorganizations - Exemption By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129
Budget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0123 /CH0137 Major Information Technology Development Project Fund - Revenue Sources and Authorized Expenditures By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 137
Budget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0128 Education - Compensatory Education Grants - Federal Community Eligibility Provision By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0998 /CH0575 (HB0821) Academic Facilities Bonding Authority By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 575
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM