Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Budget And Taxation Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0034 /CH0344
Title
Motor Vehicles - Leased Vehicles - Inspections, Insurance, and Excise Tax
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0495 /CH0339 (HB0091)
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Terminals - Transfer of Ownership and Local Impact Grants
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0496 /CH0445 (HB0090)
Title
Gaming - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Licensee Payments
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0497 /CH0446 (HB0093)
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities - Operation License Renewal Term and Local Development Council Membership
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0498 /CH0453 (HB0092)
Title
Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Transfer of Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0034 /CH0344 Motor Vehicles - Leased Vehicles - Inspections, Insurance, and Excise Tax By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 344
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2017 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0495 /CH0339 (HB0091) Gaming - Video Lottery Terminals - Transfer of Ownership and Local Impact Grants By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0496 /CH0445 (HB0090) Gaming - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Licensee Payments By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 445
Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0497 /CH0446 (HB0093) Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities - Operation License Renewal Term and Local Development Council Membership By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446
Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0498 /CH0453 (HB0092) Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Transfer of Authority By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 453
Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM