Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Baltimore County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0155
Title
Baltimore County Revenue Authority - Purchases - Competitive Bidding
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0320 /CH0033 (SB0217/CH0032)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates for Individuals with Disabilities - Parking in Baltimore County
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1475 (SB1070)
Title
Baltimore County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1524 /CH0691
Title
Election Law - Baltimore County Democratic Party Central Committee - Membership
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0321 (SB0218)
Title
Baltimore County Code of Public Local Laws - 2013 Edition - Legalization
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1400
Title
Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0155 Baltimore County Revenue Authority - Purchases - Competitive Bidding By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0320 /CH0033 (SB0217/CH0032) Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates for Individuals with Disabilities - Parking in Baltimore County By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 33
Environmental Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1475 (SB1070) Baltimore County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1524 /CH0691 Election Law - Baltimore County Democratic Party Central Committee - Membership By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 691
Ways and Means
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0321 (SB0218) Baltimore County Code of Public Local Laws - 2013 Edition - Legalization By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB1400 Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM