Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Baltimore County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0012 (SB0331/CH0339)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Baltimore County Deputy Sheriff
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0183 (SB0330/CH0159)
Title
Baltimore County Code of Public Local Laws - 2015 Edition - Legalization
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0257 (SB0702/CH0048)
Title
Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Homes Near a Refuse Disposal System
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0292
Title
Baltimore County - Regulation of Parking on York Road
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0892 (SB0329)
Title
Baltimore County - Civil Actions - Subpoena for Police Officer - Liability of Party for Reimbursement of Cost
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0895 (SB0466/CH0352)
Title
Baltimore County - Education - Junior Reserve Officer Training Corps Instructors
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0926 (SB0321/CH0126)
Title
Baltimore City and Baltimore County - Police Behavioral Health Units - Pilot Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1180 (SB0831)
Title
Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0012 (SB0331/CH0339) Workers' Compensation - Baltimore County Deputy Sheriff By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0183 (SB0330/CH0159) Baltimore County Code of Public Local Laws - 2015 Edition - Legalization By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0257 (SB0702/CH0048) Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Homes Near a Refuse Disposal System By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0292 Baltimore County - Regulation of Parking on York Road By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0892 (SB0329) Baltimore County - Civil Actions - Subpoena for Police Officer - Liability of Party for Reimbursement of Cost By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0895 (SB0466/CH0352) Baltimore County - Education - Junior Reserve Officer Training Corps Instructors By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Ways and Means
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0926 (SB0321/CH0126) Baltimore City and Baltimore County - Police Behavioral Health Units - Pilot Program By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1180 (SB0831) Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM