Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Baltimore County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0074 /CH0367
Title
Education - Career Exploration and Development Activities - Coffee (Java Act)
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0076 /CH0368
Title
Baltimore County Board of Education - Education Transparency Act
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0087 /CH0800
Title
Baltimore County Board of Education – Nonstudent Member Compensation and Student Member Scholarships
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0320
Title
Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Standing
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0334 /CH0079 (SB0306/CH0080)
Title
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Transfers
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1393 /CH0761
Title
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Interest in Multiple Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1395 /CH0762
Title
Baltimore County – Alcoholic Beverages – Authorization for Issuing an Additional Class B License – Repealed
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1396 /CH0763
Title
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1410 /CH0764
Title
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Expiration
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1575 /CH0765
Title
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Class B Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1600 /CH0496
Title
Baltimore County Anti–Bullying Task Force
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0074 /CH0367 Education - Career Exploration and Development Activities - Coffee (Java Act) By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 367
Ways and Means
2/01/2018 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0076 /CH0368 Baltimore County Board of Education - Education Transparency Act By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Ways and Means
2/01/2018 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0087 /CH0800 Baltimore County Board of Education – Nonstudent Member Compensation and Student Member Scholarships By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 800
Ways and Means
2/01/2018 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0320 Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Standing By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0334 /CH0079 (SB0306/CH0080) Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Transfers By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 79
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1393 /CH0761 Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Interest in Multiple Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 761
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1395 /CH0762 Baltimore County – Alcoholic Beverages – Authorization for Issuing an Additional Class B License – Repealed By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 762
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1396 /CH0763 Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor License By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 763
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1410 /CH0764 Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Expiration By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 764
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1575 /CH0765 Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Class B Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 765
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1600 /CH0496 Baltimore County Anti–Bullying Task Force By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 496
Ways and Means
3/09/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM