Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Calvert County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0759
Title
Calvert County - Deer Hunting - Sundays
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1054
Title
Calvert County - Board of License Commissioners - Notice and Hearing on Proposed Legislation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1056
Title
Calvert County - Length of Service Award - Fire Fighters, Rescue Squad Members, and Rescue Dive Team Members - Increase Authorized
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1079 /CH0487
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1106
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Volunteer Fire Companies and Fraternal Organizations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1107
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bottle Clubs - Prohibitions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1184 (SB0168/CH0043)
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1436
Title
Calvert County - Salaries of County Officials and County Commissioner Retirement Plan Participation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0759 Calvert County - Deer Hunting - Sundays By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1054 Calvert County - Board of License Commissioners - Notice and Hearing on Proposed Legislation By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1056 Calvert County - Length of Service Award - Fire Fighters, Rescue Squad Members, and Rescue Dive Team Members - Increase Authorized By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1079 /CH0487 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 487
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1106 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Volunteer Fire Companies and Fraternal Organizations By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1107 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bottle Clubs - Prohibitions By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1184 (SB0168/CH0043) Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 PM
HB1436 Calvert County - Salaries of County Officials and County Commissioner Retirement Plan Participation By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM