Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Calvert County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0075
Title
Calvert County - Board of License Commissioners - Notice and Hearing on Proposed Legislation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0167 (SB0230/CH0154)
Title
Calvert County - Length of Service Award Program - Recipient Benefits
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0354 /CH0242
Title
Calvert County - Task Force to Study the Commemoration of Harriet Elizabeth Brown
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0544 /CH0259
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bottle Clubs
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0902 (SB0362/CH0027)
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0075 Calvert County - Board of License Commissioners - Notice and Hearing on Proposed Legislation By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0167 (SB0230/CH0154) Calvert County - Length of Service Award Program - Recipient Benefits By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0354 /CH0242 Calvert County - Task Force to Study the Commemoration of Harriet Elizabeth Brown By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 242
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0544 /CH0259 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bottle Clubs By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 259
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0902 (SB0362/CH0027) Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Appropriations
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM