Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Calvert County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1155
Title
Calvert County - Bonding Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1156 /CH0416
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer or Wine Festival License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1157 /CH0302
Title
Calvert County - Assistant Sheriff - Salary and Status
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1268 /CH0506
Title
Calvert County - Pretrial Release Program - Nonviolent Felon
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1353 /CH0650
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event Festival Permit
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1445 /CH0138
Title
Calvert County - Property Tax Credit - Commerce Zones
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1483
Title
Calvert County - Procurement Contracts - Reciprocal Preference for Resident Bidders
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1493 /CH0140
Title
Calvert County - Economic Development Incentive Fund - Eligibility Criteria
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1155 Calvert County - Bonding Authority By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Appropriations
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 PM
HB1156 /CH0416 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer or Wine Festival License By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1157 /CH0302 Calvert County - Assistant Sheriff - Salary and Status By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1268 /CH0506 Calvert County - Pretrial Release Program - Nonviolent Felon By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 506
Judiciary
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1353 /CH0650 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event Festival Permit By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 650
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1445 /CH0138 Calvert County - Property Tax Credit - Commerce Zones By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 138
Ways and Means
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1483 Calvert County - Procurement Contracts - Reciprocal Preference for Resident Bidders By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1493 /CH0140 Calvert County - Economic Development Incentive Fund - Eligibility Criteria By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM