Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Calvert County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1423 /CH0310
Title
Calvert County - Board of License Commissioners - Notice and Hearing on Proposed Legislation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1439 (SB0473/CH0080)
Title
Calvert County - Bonding Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1440 /CH0146
Title
Calvert County - Solid Waste Disposal Contracts
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1478
Title
Calvert County - Competitive Bidding Process
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1423 /CH0310 Calvert County - Board of License Commissioners - Notice and Hearing on Proposed Legislation By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1439 (SB0473/CH0080) Calvert County - Bonding Authority By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Appropriations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1440 /CH0146 Calvert County - Solid Waste Disposal Contracts By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 146
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1478 Calvert County - Competitive Bidding Process By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM