Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Calvert County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0446 /CH0111
Title
Calvert County - Fire and Rescue Commission - Membership
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0498 /CH0112
Title
Calvert County - Salary of Assistant Sheriff
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0627 /CH0113
Title
Calvert County - Length of Service Award Program - Death Benefits
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0725
Title
Calvert County - Budget Changes - Publication and Hearing Threshold
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0727 /CH0743
Title
State Designations - State Paleontology Collection and Research Center - Calvert Marine Museum
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0729 /CH0114
Title
Calvert County - County Budget - Changes to Adopted Budget
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0815 /CH0744
Title
Calvert County - Procurement - Contracts and Bidding
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1084
Title
Calvert County - County Superintendent of Schools - Postemployment Compensation and Benefits
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1102 /CH0115
Title
Calvert County - Bonding Authority - Enterprise Fund
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1105
Title
Job-Related Alcohol and Controlled Dangerous Substances Testing - Medical Review Officers and Preliminary Breath Tests
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1114 /CH0116
Title
Calvert County - Procurement Contracts - Reciprocal Preference for Resident Bidders
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1354 /CH0117
Title
Calvert County - Bonding Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1357 /CH0841
Title
Calvert County - County Officials - Salaries
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1458
Title
District Court – County Zoning Violation – Appeals
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1459 /CH0118
Title
Calvert County – Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund and Distribution From Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1484
Title
Calvert County - Class NB Instant Bingo License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0446 /CH0111 Calvert County - Fire and Rescue Commission - Membership By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0498 /CH0112 Calvert County - Salary of Assistant Sheriff By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0627 /CH0113 Calvert County - Length of Service Award Program - Death Benefits By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0725 Calvert County - Budget Changes - Publication and Hearing Threshold By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0727 /CH0743 State Designations - State Paleontology Collection and Research Center - Calvert Marine Museum By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 743
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0729 /CH0114 Calvert County - County Budget - Changes to Adopted Budget By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0815 /CH0744 Calvert County - Procurement - Contracts and Bidding By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 744
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1084 Calvert County - County Superintendent of Schools - Postemployment Compensation and Benefits By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1102 /CH0115 Calvert County - Bonding Authority - Enterprise Fund By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1105 Job-Related Alcohol and Controlled Dangerous Substances Testing - Medical Review Officers and Preliminary Breath Tests By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1114 /CH0116 Calvert County - Procurement Contracts - Reciprocal Preference for Resident Bidders By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1354 /CH0117 Calvert County - Bonding Authority By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 117
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1357 /CH0841 Calvert County - County Officials - Salaries By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 841
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1458 District Court – County Zoning Violation – Appeals By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1459 /CH0118 Calvert County – Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund and Distribution From Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1484 Calvert County - Class NB Instant Bingo License By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM